NC S458 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ch. SL 2019-225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

PTS Day/Cardiac Task Force/Titus's Law/Data

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTS Day/Cardiac Task Force/Titus's Law/Data

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-08-13 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-08-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18 Ch. SL 2019-225
2019-09-18 Signed by Gov. 9/18/2019
2019-09-16 Pres. To Gov. 9/16/2019
2019-09-13 Ratified
2019-09-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-12SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-09-12SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-09-12SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-09-12SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/16/2019
2019-09-12SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-09-11SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/12/2019
2019-09-11SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-09-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/11/2019
2019-09-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-29HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-08-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/10/2019
2019-08-28SenateConf Com Reported
2019-08-28HousePlaced On Cal For 08/29/2019
2019-08-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-08-28HouseConf Com Reported
2019-08-21HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-08-16SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-08-13SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-08-07SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-05HousePlaced On Cal For 08/06/2019
2019-08-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-05HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-07-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenateEngrossed
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-05-02SenateReconsidered 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S458
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S458v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S458v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S458v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S458v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S458v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S458v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S458v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/162
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/161
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/155
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/728
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/548
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/805
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/592

Bill Comments

feedback