NC S468 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-564
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-564
Summary
Authorize Insurance for Former Employees.
Title
Authorize Insurance for Former Employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-564 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-23 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-23 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-23 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-24 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-06-24 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2009 | |
2009-06-22 | Withdrawn from Cal 6/29/2009 | |
2009-06-22 | Postponed To 6/29/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-03 | Re-ref Com On Insurance | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Insurance | |
2009-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-14 | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-09 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S468 |