NC S476 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Ch. SL 2020-7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

School-Based Mental Health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School-Based Mental Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 3 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-07-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-08 Ch. SL 2020-7
2020-06-08 Signed by Gov. 6/8/2020
2020-05-29 Pres. To Gov. 5/29/2020
2020-05-28 Ratified
2020-05-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-05-27SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-05-27SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-05-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-05-27HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-05-26HousePlaced On Cal For 05/27/2020
2020-05-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2020-05-26HouseConf Com Reported
2020-05-26SenateRe-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
2020-05-26SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2020-05-26SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/27/2020
2020-05-26SenateConf Com Reported
2020-05-20SenateConferees Reappointed
2020-05-20SenateConf Com Dismissed
2019-10-31HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-10-31SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-22SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-11HousePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-04HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-04HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-22HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenateAmend Tabled A1
2019-04-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S476
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S476v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S476v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S476v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S476v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S476v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S476v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S476v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/102
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/119
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/118
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/669
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/512
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/684

Bill Comments

feedback