NC S482 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
LLC Clarifications & Emp. Invention Ownership
Title
LLC Clarifications & Emp. Invention Ownership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 1 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 1 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | Ch. SL 2016-114 | |
2016-07-28 | Signed by Gov. 7/28/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2016 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-30 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2016 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2016 |
2016-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2016-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary I |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |