NC S483 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Vacation Rental Act Changes
Title
Vacation Rental Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Ch. SL 2019-73 | |
2019-07-01 | Signed by Gov. 7/1/2019 | |
2019-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019 | |
2019-06-26 | Ratified | |
2019-06-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019 |
2019-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-20 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/08/2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H922 (Same As) 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-176