NC S487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Student Meal Debt Policy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Meal Debt Policy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2019-05-06SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback