NC S498 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Facilitate Response to Disasters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitate Response to Disasters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-187
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019
2019-07-23 Ratified
2019-07-22HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-17HousePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRef to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-07-10HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-07-10SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-10SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-07-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-09SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-09SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-09SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-09SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H538 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback