NC S5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Safety Omnibus
Title
School Safety Omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2019-08-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/07/2019 |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-24 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2019 |
2019-07-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2019-07-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2019 |
2019-07-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-07-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-28 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-07 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-05-07 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2019-05-07 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2019-05-07 | House | Serial Referral To Pensions and Retirement Stricken |
2019-02-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amend Failed A4 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |