NC S50 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ch. SL 2016-65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ch. SL 2016-65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wilson County Occupancy Tax Modification
Title
Wilson County Occupancy Tax Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 96 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-07-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 96 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-07-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Ch. SL 2016-65 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Conf Rpt Recon/withdrawn |
2016-05-16 | House | Conf Report #2 Adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/16/2016 |
2016-05-12 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2016-05-11 | House | Re-ref to Conf Com |
2016-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-08-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-08-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-08-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/05/2015 |
2015-08-04 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/05/2015 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-07-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2015 |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-07-21 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-07-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/20/2015 |
2015-07-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-07-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-16 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed |