NC S500 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Advanced Math Course Enrollment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Advanced Math Course Enrollment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - A1 Elmore Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11 Ch. SL 2019-120
2019-07-11 Signed by Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-01 Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-28 Ratified
2019-06-28SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-27HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-06-27SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2019
2019-06-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-06-26HouseConf Com Reported
2019-06-26SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2019
2019-06-26SenateConf Com Reported
2019-06-20HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-06-18SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-06-17SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-06-14SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-13HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-12HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-06-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-12HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-10HousePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2019
2019-06-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-20HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-07SenateEngrossed
2019-05-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H591 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S500
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S500v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/187
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/216
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/215
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/490
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/489
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/315
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/565
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/393

Bill Comments

feedback