NC S508 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amd. Bail Bond/Coll. Agcy/Crim. Mediat'n Laws
Title
Amd. Bail Bond/Coll. Agcy/Crim. Mediat'n Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A2 Stam Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A1 Hall, D. Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A2 Stam Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A1 Hall, D. Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Ch. SL 2016-107 | |
2016-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-07-01 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-07-01 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-07-01 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-07-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2016-05-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-05-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Engrossed | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |