NC S521 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rule in Dumpor's Case/Broker Price Opinions
Title
Rule in Dumpor's Case/Broker Price Opinions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-163 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-27 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-26 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-09 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-05-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-02 | Placed On Cal For 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |