NC S536 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Water/Wastewater Public Enterprise Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water/Wastewater Public Enterprise Reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H570 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback