NC S559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Ch. SL 2019-244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Ch. SL 2019-244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Storm Securitization
Title
Storm Securitization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-20 - House - A1 Strickland Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-08-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion 11 to Divide (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-20 - House - A1 Strickland Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-08-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion 11 to Divide (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Ch. SL 2019-244 | |
2019-11-06 | Signed by Gov. 11/6/2019 | |
2019-11-01 | Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019 | |
2019-10-31 | Ratified | |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Conf Report #2 Adopted |
2019-10-29 | House | Conf Report #2 Adopted |
2019-10-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-10-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/30/2019 |
2019-10-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-10-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/30/2019 |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Conf Com #2 Reported |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Conf Rpt Recon/withdrawn |
2019-10-29 | House | Conf Rpt Withdrawn |
2019-10-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-10-02 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-01 | House | Conferees Changed |
2019-08-27 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/27/2019 |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-08-21 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-08-20 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-08-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-08-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-08-20 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-08-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/20/2019 |
2019-08-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-07-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-10 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-16 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-07 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Divide Question Failed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H624 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House