NC S56 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Ch. SL 2019-6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue Laws Technical Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue Laws Technical Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20 Ch. SL 2019-6
2019-03-20 Signed by Gov. 3/20/2019
2019-03-19 Pres. To Gov. 3/19/2019
2019-03-18 Ratified
2019-03-14HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-14HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-11HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-04HouseRef to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-28HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-02-28SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-02-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-21SenatePlaced On Cal For 02/26/2019
2019-02-21SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-02-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-14SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H60 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback