NC S562 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Ch. SL 2020-35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

The Second Chance Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Second Chance Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25 Ch. SL 2020-35
2020-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2020
2020-06-18 Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2020
2020-06-17 Ratified
2020-06-16SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-16SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2020-06-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/16/2020
2020-06-15SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-06-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-09HousePlaced On Cal For 06/10/2020
2020-06-09HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-09HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-08-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-29HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-26HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-26HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-20HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-14HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-14HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-14HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-09HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-09HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-09HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-09HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-05HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-24HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-24HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-22HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-28HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-28HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-05-08SenateEngrossed
2019-05-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-08SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-07SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H874 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S562
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S562v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/228
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/227
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/949
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/753

Bill Comments

feedback