NC S568 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Recycling and Restoration/Renewable Energy
Title
Recycling and Restoration/Renewable Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Newton [R] | Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Ted Alexander [R] |
Sen. Deanna Ballard [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Filed |