NC S574 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Ch. SL 2019-217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Study Establish Gaming Comm/Sports Betting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study Establish Gaming Comm/Sports Betting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - A1 Warren Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - A2 Kidwell Second Reading (Y: 11 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - A3 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04 Ch. SL 2019-217
2019-09-04 Signed by Gov. 9/4/2019
2019-09-03 Pres. To Gov. 9/3/2019
2019-08-30 Ratified
2019-08-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-29HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-08-28SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-08-28HousePlaced On Cal For 08/29/2019
2019-08-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-08-28HouseConf Com Reported
2019-08-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-08-28SenateConf Com Reported
2019-08-19HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-08-16SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-08-07SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-08-06SenateReptd Unfav For Conc
2019-07-23SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-07-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/23/2019
2019-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-11SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-11HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-07-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-11HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-07-11HouseAmend Failed A2
2019-07-11HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-10HousePlaced On Cal For 07/11/2019
2019-07-10HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-07-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-05-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-07SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-29SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H548 (Same As) 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-43

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S574
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S574v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S574v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S574v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S574v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S574v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S574v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/229
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/662
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/661
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/660
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/659
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/540
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/581
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/806

Bill Comments

feedback