NC S59 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ch. SL 2010-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ch. SL 2010-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Atty. Fees/Alimony
Title
Atty. Fees/Alimony
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Ch. SL 2010-14 | |
2010-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Ratified | |
2010-06-16 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-06-15 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-05-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-05-25 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-05-25 | Rec From House | |
2010-05-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Placed On Cal For 5/24/2010 | |
2010-05-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-05-20 | serial referral to Appropriations stricken | |
2010-05-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |