NC S6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Ch. SL 2019-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Dare County/CC Construction Funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dare County/CC Construction Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Ch. SL 2019-9
2019-03-29 Signed by Gov. 3/29/2019
2019-03-22 Pres. To Gov. 3/22/2019
2019-03-21 Ratified
2019-03-20HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-18HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-07HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-26HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Capital
2019-02-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-20HouseRef to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Appropriations, Capital, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-02-19SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-02-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-14SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-13SenateSequential Referral To Education/Higher Education Stricken
2019-02-06SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-06SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-01-31SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-01-31SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H19 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback