NC S600 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Ch. SL 2019-214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Vets Children/Short-Term Workforce Training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vets Children/Short-Term Workforce Training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - A1 Cleveland Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04 Ch. SL 2019-214
2019-09-04 Signed by Gov. 9/4/2019
2019-08-28 Pres. To Gov. 8/28/2019
2019-08-27 Ratified
2019-08-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-26SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-08-22SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-21HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-21HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-08-21HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-21HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-19HousePlaced On Cal For 08/21/2019
2019-08-19HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-12HousePlaced On Cal For 08/13/2019
2019-08-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-12HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-30SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-29SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-04SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S600
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S600v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S600v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S600v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S600v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S600v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S600v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S600v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/163
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/780
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/779
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/567

Bill Comments

feedback