NC S604 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Amend NC Veterinary Practice Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend NC Veterinary Practice Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-15SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-07-11SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-10HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-08HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-07SenateEngrossed
2019-05-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-07SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback