NC S605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Ch. SL 2019-15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Highway Storm Recovery Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway Storm Recovery Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Ch. SL 2019-15
2019-05-16 Signed by Gov. 5/16/2019
2019-05-15 Pres. To Gov. 5/15/2019
2019-05-15 Ratified
2019-05-15HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-13HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Transportation
2019-05-13HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-07HousePlaced On Cal For 05/15/2019
2019-05-07HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-08SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback