NC S610 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize Northern Peaks Trail

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize Northern Peaks Trail

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-26 Ratified
2019-06-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-24HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-19HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-19HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-13HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-13HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-22HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-16SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-04SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback