NC S620 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Electric Standup Scooters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Standup Scooters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateRe-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
2019-07-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback