NC S621 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Conferees Changed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Testing Reduction Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Testing Reduction Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-07-10 - House - A1 Elmore Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-18SenateConferees Changed
2019-07-17HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-07-15SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-15SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-07-11SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-07-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-10HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-09SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S621
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S621v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S621v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S621v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S621v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S621v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S621v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/129
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/640
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/639
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/494

Bill Comments

feedback