NC S63 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ch. SL 2019-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ch. SL 2019-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
City of Kannapolis/Annexation
Title
City of Kannapolis/Annexation
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Ch. SL 2019-12 | |
2019-04-29 | Ratified | |
2019-04-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-03-25 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-21 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H84 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate