NC S674 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Truck Dealer Cost Reimbursement
Title
Truck Dealer Cost Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |