NC S675 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary I
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary I
Summary
Amend Public Health-Related Laws.
Title
Amend Public Health-Related Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S675 |