NC S675 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-03 - Ch. SL 2010-185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-03 - Ch. SL 2010-185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit Medicaid Fraud/Kickbacks
Title
Prohibit Medicaid Fraud/Kickbacks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-03 | Ch. SL 2010-185 | |
2010-08-03 | Signed By Gov. 8/3/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |