NC S678 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Ch. Res 2019-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Ch. Res 2019-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Robert Conner to Mining Commission
Title
Confirm Robert Conner to Mining Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Ch. Res 2019-17 |
2019-10-31 | Ratified | |
2019-10-31 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-10-31 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-24 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Filed |