NC S679 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Ch. Res 2019-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Ch. Res 2019-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
GA Meet Old Capitol on D-Day Anniversary
Title
GA Meet Old Capitol on D-Day Anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ch. Res 2019-11 |
2019-06-05 | Ratified | |
2019-06-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2019 |
2019-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2019-06-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-31 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Filed |