NC S680 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Observe the 75th Anniversary of D-Day
Title
Observe the 75th Anniversary of D-Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2019 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Filed |