NC S681 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Conferees Reappointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Rur Hlth Care/Loc. Sales Tax Flex/Util. Acct

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rur Hlth Care/Loc. Sales Tax Flex/Util. Acct

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-13 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-08-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03SenateConferees Reappointed
2019-10-03SenateConf Com Dismissed
2019-08-27SenateConferees Changed
2019-08-20HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-08-16SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-08-13SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-08-09SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-05HousePlaced On Cal For 08/06/2019
2019-07-31HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-31HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-07-24HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-24HouseRuled Material
2019-07-24HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-09HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-09HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-04HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-07-02HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-07-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-24SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-20SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback