NC S687 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Ch. Res 2019-14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

SBOE Confirmation/Jt. Session

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SBOE Confirmation/Jt. Session

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenateCh. Res 2019-14
2019-08-09 Ratified
2019-08-08HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-08HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-08HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-08HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-08-08HouseCal Pursuant 32
2019-08-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-08-08HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-08-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-08-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-06SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-08-06SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-07-10SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback