NC S692 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Ch. SL 2019-219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

2019 Senate Consensus Nonpartisan Map

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2019 Senate Consensus Nonpartisan Map

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17 Ch. SL 2019-219
2019-09-17 Ratified
2019-09-17HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-17HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-09-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-09-17HouseReptd Fav
2019-09-16HouseRef To Com On Redistricting
2019-09-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-09-16HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-09-16SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-09-16SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-13SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-09-13SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-09-12SenateRef To Com On Redistricting and Elections
2019-09-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-09-11SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback