NC S7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Food Stand Seating & Outdoor Food Service
Title
Food Stand Seating & Outdoor Food Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Ch. SL 2015-104 | |
2015-06-24 | Signed by Gov. 6/24/2015 | |
2015-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 06/16/2015 | |
2015-06-15 | Ratified | |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2015 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-06-10 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | House | Postponed To 06/09/2015 |
2015-06-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2015 |
2015-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development |
2015-05-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed |