NC S704 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Ch. SL 2010-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Ch. SL 2010-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reform Low-Performing Schools
Title
Reform Low-Performing Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Ch. SL 2010-1 | |
2010-05-27 | Signed By Gov. 5/27/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Pres. To Gov. 5/27/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Ratified | |
2010-05-27 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-05-27 | Placed On Cal For 5/27/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-05-26 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-05-26 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-05-26 | Rec From House | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2010-05-25 | Amendment Ruled Out of Order 3 | |
2010-05-25 | Amend 3 Offered | |
2010-05-25 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2010-05-25 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-05-24 | Placed On Cal For 5/25/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-05-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-20 | serial referral stricken bill is re-referred to Education | |
2010-05-20 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |