NC S715 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Various Changes to the Revenue Laws
Title
Various Changes to the Revenue Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/29/2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/24/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H975 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Ref To Com On Finance