NC S716 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
2010 Ethics and Government Reform Changes
Title
2010 Ethics and Government Reform Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |