NC S721 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Unauthorized Practice of Medicine
Title
Unauthorized Practice of Medicine
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Goss [D] | Sen. David Hoyle [D] | Rep. Joe Queen [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2010-05-17 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-12 | Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Mental Health & Youth Services | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |