NC S734 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Ch. SL 2014-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Ch. SL 2014-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulatory Reform Act of 2014
Title
Regulatory Reform Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-15 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A6 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-06-25 - House - A6 Meyer M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A5 Collins Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A4 Brody Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A3 Jordan Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A2 Jordan Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A1 Lucas Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 16 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 15 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 14 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 13 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 12 (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A6 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-06-25 - House - A6 Meyer M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A5 Collins Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A4 Brody Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A3 Jordan Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A2 Jordan Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - A1 Lucas Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 16 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 15 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 14 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 13 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 12 (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Ch. SL 2014-120 | |
2014-09-18 | Signed by Gov. 9/18/2014 | |
2014-08-15 | Pres. To Gov. 08/15/2014 | |
2014-08-15 | Ratified | |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-15 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-08-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/15/2014 |
2014-08-14 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-08-14 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2014-08-14 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Ways & Means |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Failed A6 |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-06-25 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2014 |
2014-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-24 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken |
2014-06-03 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Added |
2014-06-03 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2014-05-29 | Engrossed | |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A16 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A15 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A14 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A13 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A12 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A11 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A10 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/29/2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Failed A8 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A9 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Failed A6 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A7 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Failed A5 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Failed A4 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Sequential Referral To State and Local Government Stricken |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1136 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform