NC S739 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ch. SL 2016-67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ch. SL 2016-67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Town of Rolesville/Annexation
Title
Town of Rolesville/Annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - For Concurrence Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Ch. SL 2016-67 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2016-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Filed |