NC S75 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Ch. SL 2019-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Restore Ct. of Appeals Membership

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restore Ct. of Appeals Membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Ch. SL 2019-2
2019-02-27 Signed by Gov. 2/27/2019
2019-02-27 Pres. To Gov. 2/27/2019
2019-02-27 Ratified
2019-02-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-02-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-25HousePlaced On Cal For 02/27/2019
2019-02-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-02-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-21HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-21HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-02-21SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-02-21SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-19SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-19SenateRef to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-18SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback