NC S750 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health-Local Confinement/Vet. Controlled Sub
Title
Health-Local Confinement/Vet. Controlled Sub
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-76 | |
2018-06-25 | Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Ratified | |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2018-06-15 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-14 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Filed |