NC S76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate BOG Elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate BOG Elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateAdopted
2019-02-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-19SenateRef To Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2019-02-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-18SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback