NC S761 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Street Construction/Developer Responsibility
Title
Street Construction/Developer Responsibility
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Berger [R] | Sen. Harris Blake [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
Sen. Don East [R] | Sen. David Hoyle [D] | Sen. Neal Hunt [R] | Sen. Jim Jacumin [R] |
Sen. Clark Jenkins [D] | Sen. Jean Preston [R] | Sen. Albin Swindell [D] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-05 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-23 | Filed |