NC S765 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pooled Trusts/Medicaid Reimbur
Title
Pooled Trusts/Medicaid Reimbur
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-09 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-118 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-09 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 | |
2010-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-12 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2009-03-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1298 (Same As) 2009-05-20 - Held by Senate