NC S77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Ch. SL 2019-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Ag Disaster Fund/Certain Counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ag Disaster Fund/Certain Counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Ch. SL 2019-3
2019-03-08 Signed by Gov. 3/8/2019
2019-03-08 Pres. To Gov. 3/8/2019
2019-03-07 Ratified
2019-03-06HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-05HousePlaced On Cal For 03/06/2019
2019-03-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-27HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-02-26SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-02-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-21SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-19SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-19SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H127 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback