NC S770 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Ch. SL 2016-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-26 - Ch. SL 2016-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC Farm Act of 2016
Title
NC Farm Act of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Motion 12 - Appeal Rule of Chair Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - A2 Adams Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 63 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-06-29 - House - A1 Millis Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Motion 12 - Appeal Rule of Chair Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - A2 Adams Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 63 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-06-29 - House - A1 Millis Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-26 | Ch. SL 2016-113 | |
2016-07-26 | Signed by Gov. 7/26/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2016 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2016-06-29 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2016-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2016 |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Finance |
2016-06-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-21 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-20 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Judiciary II Added |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H993 (Same As) 2016-04-28 - Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations